EP0975904 - GEAR WITH CENTRAL CONTROL SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kochendörfer & Kiep Stanz- und Feinstanzwerk GmbH Maybachstrasse 3 78647 Konstanz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Kochendörfer & Kiep Stanz- und Feinstanzwerk GmbH Maybachstrasse 3 78647 Konstanz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLLMANN, Erich Hans-Holbeinstrasse 2 D-68623 Lambertheim / DE | 02 /
MELCHERS, Frank Peter Rosegger Weg 2 D-78464 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
GÖRNITZ, Siegfried Zum Walzenberg 5 D-78476 Allensbach / DE | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98948995.0 | 30.09.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998EP06192 | Priority number, date | DE1998105924 | 13.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19805924 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9941529 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975904 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/20 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
F16H63/30 (EP);
F16H61/24 (EP);
F16H2057/0056 (EP);
F16H2061/242 (EP);
F16H2063/208 (EP);
F16H2063/3076 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/05] | Title | German: | GETRIEBE MIT EINER ZENTRALSCHALTWELLE | [2000/05] | English: | GEAR WITH CENTRAL CONTROL SHAFT | [2000/05] | French: | BOITE DE VITESSES AVEC ARBRE DE SELECTION CENTRAL | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/34] | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4313564 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 31 - line 49 *; | [X]US1485278 (LANCIA) [X] 1 * figures 2-4 *; | [X]GB2140105 (PORSCHE AG) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 41-75; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US3757598 (VAN DEST J) [X] 1 * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 13 *; | [A]EP0532924 (PORSCHE AG) [A] 1 * figures 1,4,5 * |