EP1027276 - PROCEDURE FOR INSTALLING A LANDING DOOR, AND A CORRESPONDING INSTALLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2000/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KETONEN, Ari Perttulankatu 32 FIN-05900 Hyvinkää / FI | 02 /
HÄGG, Jori Ilmattarentie 10 FIN-11910 Riihimäki / FI | 03 /
ANTTILA, Harri Keskitie 10 FIN-05400 Jokela / FI | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Zipse + Habersack Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98949014.9 | 15.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998FI00806 | Priority number, date | FI19970004158 | 06.11.1997 Original published format: FI 974158 | FI19980001992 | 15.09.1998 Original published format: FI 981992 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9924347 | Date: | 20.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027276 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027276 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/30 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
B66B13/303 (EP,US);
B66B13/30 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINBAU EINER SCHACHTTÜR UND ENTSPRECHENDE AUSRÜSTUNG | [2000/33] | English: | PROCEDURE FOR INSTALLING A LANDING DOOR, AND A CORRESPONDING INSTALLATION SYSTEM | [2000/33] | French: | TECHNIQUE D'INSTALLATION D'UNE PORTE PALIERE, ET EQUIPEMENT REQUIS | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 26.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP10001275 ; | [X]JP04133990 ; | [X]JP03297789 ; | [Y]GB826175 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO); | [X]WO9532912 (SELCOM SPA [IT], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN & JP 10001275 A (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) 6 January 1998., & JP10001275 A 19980106 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN & JP 04133990 A (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) 7 May 1992., & JP04133990 A 19920507 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN & JP 03297789 A (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) 27 December 1991., & JP03297789 A 19911227 |