EP1027029 - IMPROVED PERSONAL CARE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lurident Ltd. P.O. Box 2476 76120 Rehovot / IL | [2000/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LURIYA, Elena Naftali Ben-Ephraim 8/17 76214 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
LURIYA, Leonid Naftali Ben-Ephraim 8/17 76214 Rehovot / IL | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 98949227.7 | 18.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998IL00504 | Priority number, date | IL19970122084 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: IL 12208497 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9922703 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027029 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, A61K9/127, A61K9/107, A61K9/113 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP);
A61K8/04 (KR);
A61K31/085 (EP);
A61K31/155 (EP);
A61K8/0291 (EP);
A61K8/347 (EP);
A61K8/43 (EP);
A61K8/553 (EP);
A61K8/84 (EP);
A61K9/0053 (EP);
A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/33] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE KÖRPERPFLEGE FORMULIERUNGEN | [2000/33] | English: | IMPROVED PERSONAL CARE FORMULATIONS | [2000/33] | French: | FORMULATIONS AMELIOREES DE SOINS PERSONNELS | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/46] | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4814161 (JINKS PHILIP A [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 52; example 5; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US5338761 (NAKAJIMA HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8* column 2, lines 49-63; example 19; claims 1-6 * | International search | [Y]US4670185 (FUJIWARA MASAMI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4767615 (GEHO W BLAIR [US], et al); | [Y]US5128139 (BROWN DELL G [US], et al); | [Y]US5376646 (PITTROF FOLKER [US], et al); | [Y]US5443840 (MORANCAIS JEAN-LUC [FR], et al); | [Y]US5576016 (AMSELEM SHIMON [IL], et al); | [Y]US5626868 (MORANCAIS JEAN-LUC [FR], et al); | [Y]US5662932 (AMSELEM SHIMON [IL], et al); | [Y]US5679374 (FANCHON CHANTAL [FR], et al) |