EP1078422 - SLOT ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELLNET DATA SYSTEMS, INC. 125 Shoreway Road San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [2001/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Robert, J. 34978 Locke Avenue Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, David, L. 3010 Crater Lane San Jose, CA 95132 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2001/09] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98949332.5 | 10.09.1998 | [2001/09] | WO1998US18864 | Priority number, date | US19970929161 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: US 929161 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9914820 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078422 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/10, H01Q13/12 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H01Q13/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/09] | H01Q13/10 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/09] | Title | German: | SCHLITZANTENNE | [2001/09] | English: | SLOT ANTENNA | [2001/09] | French: | ANTENNE A FENTE | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.04.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 19.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 02 | 05.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/50] | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3634704 (STIX THOMAS H) [X] 1-3,5,9-12,15-20,22,27-30 * column 6, lines 34-66; figure 1 * [A] 33,34,37,38,41,42,51,53,54 | International search | [X]US2611865 |