EP0989846 - NON-IRRITATING COSMETIC AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-L Management Corp. 767 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10153 / US | [2000/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNIGHT, E., Althea 308 Herrick Avenue Teaneck, NJ 07666 / US | 02 /
MAES, Daniel, H. 279A Nassau Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | 03 /
CASTILLO-BUCCI, Carmen 14 Andrea Lane Greenlawn, NY 11740 / US | 04 /
ZECCHINO, Jules 30 Auryansen Court Closter, NJ 07624 / US | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Pochart, François, et al Cabinet Hirsch-Desrousseaux-Pochart 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Pochart, François, et al Cabinet Hirsch-Desrousseaux-Pochart, 34 rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98949425.7 | 22.09.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998US19803 | Priority number, date | US19970940783 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: US 940783 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9916412 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989846 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989846 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/50, A61K9/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/67 (KR);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (KR);
A61K8/553 (EP,US);
A61K8/602 (EP,US);
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K8/671 (EP,US);
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/14] | A61K7/48, A61K7/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | NICHTIRRITIERENDE KOSMETISCHE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2000/14] | English: | NON-IRRITATING COSMETIC AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2000/14] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET COSMETIQUES NON IRRITANTES | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 23.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.11.2004 | GR | 24.02.2005 | [2005/26] |
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB906000 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [X] 1,2,9,10,12,17,20,21 * example 9 *; | [X]FR2403800 (GENIEYZ FRANCIS [FR]) [X] 1,2,9-12,17,20-22 * example 2; claims 1,5,8-10 *; | [X]EP0330496 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,9-12,20,21 * example 3 *; | [X]EP0439042 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1,2,9,10,12,17,20,21 * examples 4,5,10 *; | [X]EP0611565 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,9-12,17,20-22 * examples 2-5 *; | [X]WO9607396 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-13,17,20-23,26 * examples 7,8,8-II *; | [X]DE4444237 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,10,12,17,20,21 * example 13 *; | [A]FR2732595 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9731620 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-13,17,20-23,26 * examples 7,8,8-II,9-A, *; | [XP]WO9746221 (ROC SA [FR], et al) [XP] 1-3,9-13,17,20-23,26,28* examples D,E *; | [XP]FR2754713 (ROC SA [FR]) [XP] 1,2,5,6,9-14,17-23,26-28 * examples 4-B * | Examination | GB1400643 | WO9114759 | US5411742 | US5650171 | WO9747289 | EP0867168 |