EP1033988 - PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING 10-HYDROXY-10,11-TETRAHYDROCARBAMAZEPINE, WATER AND GLUCOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/37] | PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CARBAMAZEPINE OR ITS DERIVATIVES | ||
[2003/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
CY
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
CY
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/10] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
CY
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Vienna / AT | |||
Former [2001/32] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
CY
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunnerstrasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2000/37] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
CY
LI
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunnerstrasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HOOGEVEST, Peter Breitenstrasse 3 CH-4416 Bubendorf / CH | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2000/37] | Becker, Konrad, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 98950110.1 | 07.10.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998EP06382 | Priority number, date | GB19970021497 | 09.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9721497 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918966 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033988 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033988 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/55, A61P25/08 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,KR,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/37] | A61K31/55 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Extension states | RO | 08.03.2000 | SI | 08.03.2000 | Title | German: | PARENTERALE ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND 10-HYDROXY-10,11-TETRAHYDROCARBAMAZEPINE, WASSER UND GLUKOSE | [2003/22] | English: | PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING 10-HYDROXY-10,11-TETRAHYDROCARBAMAZEPINE, WATER AND GLUCOSE | [2003/20] | French: | FORMULATIONS PARENTERALES CONTENANT DE LA 10-HYDROXY-10,11-TETRAHYDROCARBAMAZEPINE, DE L'EAU ET DU GLUCOSE | [2003/20] |
Former [2000/37] | PARENTERAL ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND CARBAMAZEPINE ODER DERIVATE DAVON | ||
Former [2000/37] | PARENTERAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CARBAMAZEPINE OR ITS DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2000/37] | FORMULATIONS PARENTERALES CONTENANT DE LA CARBAMAZEPINE OU DES DERIVES DE CETTE DERNIERE | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0435826 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * example 1 * [Y] 1-10; | [XY]WO9420110 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * example 3 * [Y] 1,2,7-10; | [XY]US5466683 (STERLING JEFF [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * column 3, lines 15-20 * * columns 3354-58; claims 15-17 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y] - FARAGO, "TRIGEMINAL NEURALGI: ITS TREATMENT WITH TWO NEW CARBAMAZEPINE ANALOGUES", EUROPEAN NEUROLOGY, SWITZERLAND, (1987), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 73 - 83, XP002089864 [Y] 3-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000116315 | [Y] - JAMES E. F. REYNOLDS, MARTINDALE THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA, LONDON, GREAT BRITAIN, THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS, (1993), XP002089865 [Y] 1-10 * PAGES 295-298; esp. p. 298, left column, l. 19-21 * | [X] - FASS 1996 LÄKEMEDEL I SVERIGE FÖRTECKNING ÖVER HUMANLÄKEMEDEL, SWEDEN, LINFO LÄKEMEDELSINFORMATION AB, (1996), XP002089866 [X] 1,2,7-10 * Page 992: Tegretol mixtur * |