EP1036260 - SYSTEM, SENSOR COMBINATION AND METHOD FOR REGULATING, DETECTING AS WELL AS DECIDING CURRENT FUEL-AIR RATIOS IN COMBUSTIONS ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB VOLVO 405 08 Göteborg / SE | For all designated states Mecel AB P.O. Box 73 662 22 Amal / SE | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARANZAHI, Amir Andrénsväg 38 S-692 37 Kumla / SE | 02 /
MARTENSSON, Per Hjälmsätesgatan 2A S-532 35 Linköping / SE | 03 /
GÖRAS, Anders Arjängsgatan 23 S-662 30 Amal / SE | 04 /
SALOMONSSON, Per Landsvägsgatan 21 S-413 04 Göteborg / SE | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Romare, Laila Anette, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Romare, Laila Anette, et al Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O.Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98950556.5 | 09.10.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998SE01828 | Priority number, date | SE19970003754 | 12.10.1997 Original published format: SE 9703754 | [2000/38] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919611 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036260 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036260 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F01N9/00, G01N27/407 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
F02D41/1459 (EP,US);
F02D41/1456 (EP,US);
F02D41/3809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2000/38] | Title | German: | SYSTEM,FÜHLERKOMBINATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG ,DETEKTERIERUNG UND BESTIMMUNG DES IST-VERHÄLTNISSES LUFT-BRENNSTOFF IN EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2000/38] | English: | SYSTEM, SENSOR COMBINATION AND METHOD FOR REGULATING, DETECTING AS WELL AS DECIDING CURRENT FUEL-AIR RATIOS IN COMBUSTIONS ENGINES | [2000/38] | French: | SYSTEME, ENSEMBLE DETECTEUR ET PROCEDE DE REGULATION, DETECTION ET DETERMINATION DU RAPPORT AIR-CARBURANT ACTUEL DANS LES MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1999 | Translation filed | 06.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5265416 (HAMBURG DOUGLAS R [US], et al); | [A]US5385016 (ZIMLICH GLENN A [US], et al); | [A]DE19622176 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]WO9609534 (FORSKARPATENT I LINKOEPING AB [SE], et al) |