EP1027800 - DIRECTORY ASSISTANCE METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scansoft, Inc. 9 Centennial Drive Peabody, MA 01960 / US | [2003/28] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Philips Electronics North America Corporation 1000 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086-2810 / US | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states VOICE CONTROL SYSTEMS, INC. Suite 100, 14140 Midway Road Dallas, TX 75244 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Peter, J. 3924 Bryn Mawr Dallas, TX 75225 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2002/45] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2000/33] | Gössmann, Klemens, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98950798.3 | 01.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US20530 | Priority number, date | US19970940405 | 01.10.1997 Original published format: US 940405 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9917520 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027800 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/493, H04M1/2745 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
H04M3/4931 (EP);
H04M1/27485 (EP);
H04M2201/18 (EP);
H04M3/42059 (EP);
H04M3/42102 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/33] | H04M3/42, H04M1/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/33] | Title | German: | RUFNUMMERAUSKUNFTVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM | [2000/33] | English: | DIRECTORY ASSISTANCE METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2000/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ASSISTANCE-ANNUAIRE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2004 | 31.10.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.2005 | 31.10.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5267304 (SLUSKY RONALD D [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5528680 (KARPICKE JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-4* the whole document * | International search | [X]US5267304 (SLUSKY RONALD D [US]) |