EP1076562 - GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEMENTIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 900 Welch Road, Suite 350 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1850 / US | [2006/07] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 900 Welch Road, Suite 350 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHATZBERG, Alan, F. 10380 West Loyola Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
BELANOFF, Joseph, K. 1 Southgate Drive Woodside, CA 94062 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98950912.0 | 05.10.1998 | [2001/08] | WO1998US20908 | Priority number, date | US19980085703P | 15.05.1998 Original published format: US 85703 P | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959596 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076562 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076562 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/565, A61P25/28 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/569 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (KR);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/567 (EP,US);
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/08] | A61K31/565 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEMENZ | [2001/08] | English: | GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEMENTIA | [2001/08] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE GLUCOCORTICOIDE AUX FINS DU TRAITEMENT DE LA DEMENCE | [2001/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2006 | BE | 15.02.2006 | CH | 15.02.2006 | CY | 15.02.2006 | FI | 15.02.2006 | LI | 15.02.2006 | DK | 15.05.2006 | SE | 15.05.2006 | GR | 16.05.2006 | ES | 26.05.2006 | PT | 17.07.2006 | IE | 05.10.2006 | LU | 05.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
IE | 05.10.2006 | ||
LU | 05.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
IE | 05.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
IE | 05.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.02.2006 | |
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 26.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X] - BEHL ET AL, "protection against oxidative stress-induced neuronal cell death. A novel role for RU486", EUR. J. NEUROSCI., (1997), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 912 - 920, XP002089800 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [X] - TALMI ET AL, "chronic RU486 treatment reduces age-related alterations of mouse hippocampal function", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, (1996), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 9 - 14, XP002089801 [X] 1-8 * page 13, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0197-4580(95)00094-1 | [A] - TUOR U.I., "glucocorticoids and the prevention of hypoxic-ischemic brain damage", NEUROSCIENCE AND BIOBEHAVIORAL REVIEWS, (1997), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 175 - 179, XP002089802 [A] 1-23 * page 179, column L - column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0149-7634(96)00007-3 | [A] - BIRGE ET AL, "is there a role for estrogen replacement therapy in the prevention and treatment of dementia?", J. OF THE AM. GERIATRICS SOC., (1996), vol. 44, no. 7, pages 865 - 870, XP002089803 [A] 1-8 * page 865, column R, line 5 - line 9 * |