24.06.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
24.09.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
02.07.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
09.06.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.06.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.01.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.11.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.08.2002 |
First examination report |
|
23.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.08.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
04.08.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
21.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|