Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1036290 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2004 | B1 | EP1036290 | 20.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95500297 | 20.10.1997 | US9821945 | 16.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2307647 | 07.10.2008 | C | CA2307647 | 29.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95500297 | 20.10.1997 | US9821945 | 16.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6318993 | 20.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US95500297 | 20.10.1997 | US57728100 | 23.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9920942 | Global Dossier | 29.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95500297 | 20.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2230722T | 01.05.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US95500297 | 20.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6299436 | 09.10.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US95500297 | 20.10.1997 |