EP1036290 - PLURALITY FINGERED BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Thermador Corporation 5119 District Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90040 / US | ||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Thermador Corporation 5119 Distric Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Vincent, M., S. 19136 Cecelia Place Cerritos, CA 90703 / US | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Richter, Harald BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Zentralabteilung Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Richter, Harald BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH, Zentralabteilung, Patente/Lizenzen, Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98951073.0 | 16.10.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998US21945 | Priority number, date | US19970955002 | 20.10.1997 Original published format: US 955002 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920942 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036290 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036290 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/08, F23D14/06 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
F23D14/06 (EP,US);
F24C3/085 (EP,US);
F23D2900/14064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/38] | Title | German: | STERNFÖRMIGER BRENNER | [2000/38] | English: | PLURALITY FINGERED BURNER | [2000/38] | French: | BRULEUR A DOIGTS MULTIPLES | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0581655 (EUROP EQUIP MENAGER [FR]) [Y] 1,4 * abstract *; | [Y]DE9318510U (ELEKTRO GAS ARMATUREN [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4 * page 5, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]FR2701542 (SOREMAM [FR]) [A] 2,3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0491580 (GAZ DE FRANCE [FR]) |