15.05.2009 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
07.04.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
07.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
07.03.2009 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
08.12.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
05.12.2008 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
21.06.2008 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
05.06.2008 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
05.06.2008 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
10.01.2007 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
05.01.2007 |
Opposition withdrawn |
published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] |
17.08.2006 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
08.06.2006 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
07.06.2006 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
29.03.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
19.11.2005 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.04.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
26.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
05.07.2004 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
25.02.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
30.01.2004 |
Opposition filed |
published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
28.01.2004 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
07.03.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
11.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.04.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
07.04.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
16.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|