EP1002205 - METAL SEAL AND COATING MATERIAL FOR METAL SEALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REINZ-Dichtungs-GmbH Reinzstrasse 3-7 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | [2009/25] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states REINZ-DICHTUNGS-GMBH Reinzstrasse 3-7 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERB, Wilfried Gedeckter Weg 20 D-89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 02 /
GOLLMITZER, Konrad St.-Sixtus-Strasse 6 D-89312 Günzburg / DE | 03 /
WEISS, Alfred Kastanienweg 1 D-89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98951190.2 | 14.08.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998DE02459 | Priority number, date | DE1997135390 | 14.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19735390 | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9909339 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1002205 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002205 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1002205 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/12 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
F16J15/122 (EP,US);
Y10S277/944 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/21] | Title | German: | METALLDICHTUNG UND BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL FÜR METALLDICHTUNGEN | [2000/21] | English: | METAL SEAL AND COATING MATERIAL FOR METAL SEALS | [2000/21] | French: | JOINT METALLIQUE ET MATERIAU DE RECOUVREMENT POUR JOINTS METALLIQUES | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 17.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2003
29.12.2006
WITHDRAWN ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Strasse 2 72581 Dettingen / DE Opponent's representative Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2003
29.12.2006
WITHDRAWN ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Str. 2 72581 Dettingen/Ems / DE Opponent's representative Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2003
ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Str. 2 72581 Dettingen/Ems / DE Opponent's representative Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte GbR Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | 27.02.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.06.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.12.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.04.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 19.05.2006 | Appeal received No. T0845/06 | 14.08.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.12.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 04.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.04.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0104317 (GOETZE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]GB2171109 (TBA INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS LTD) [A] 1,15* abstract *; | [A]EP0302279 (FEL PRO INC [US]) [A] 1-9,11-15 * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 10 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 18 *; | [A]US5490681 (PLUNKETT THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 10 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 5; figure 2 * | Opposition | US5615897 | JP6084785B |