EP1016141 - MULTICOLOR-COLOR SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | ||
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse 52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIEBIG, Helmut Römerstrasse 18C D-52428 Jülich / DE | 02 /
KNIPP, Dietmar Am Gerhardsbangert 1 D-53773 Hennef / DE | 03 /
FÖLSCH, Joachim Friedberger Gä chen 2 D-63755 Alzenau / DE | 04 /
WAGNER, Heribert Talstrasse 1 D-52428 Jülich / DE | [2000/27] | Application number, filing date | 98951263.7 | 28.08.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998DE02593 | Priority number, date | DE1997137561 | 28.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19737561 | [2000/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9912205 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016141 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/04 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H01L31/035272 (EP,US);
H01L25/043 (EP,US);
H01L27/14647 (EP,US);
H01L31/076 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y02E10/548 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | MEHRFARBENSENSOR | [2000/27] | English: | MULTICOLOR-COLOR SENSOR | [2000/27] | French: | DETECTEUR DE PLUSIEURS COULEURS | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4875944 (YOSHIDA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract *; | [A]WO9613865 (BOEHM MARKUS [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * figure 4; claim 10 *; | [AD]US5311047 (CHANG CHUN-YEN [TW]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD] - TOPIC M ET AL, "Stacked a-SiC:H/a-Si:H heterostructures for bias-controlled three -colour detectors", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (199605), vol. 198-200, page 1180-1184, XP004079646 [AD] 1-3,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(96)00109-3 | [A] - CESARE DE G ET AL, "VARIABLE SPECTRAL RESPONSE PHOTODETECTOR BASED ON CRYSTALLINE/ AMORPHOUS SILICON HETEROSTRUCTURE", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (19960501), vol. 198/200, no. PART 02, pages 1189 - 1192, XP000621439 [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(96)00180-9 |