EP1016173 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A FLAT CONNECTOR COMB WHICH CAN BE MOULDED INTO AN ENCLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL Tour Framatome, 1 place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMANUTZ, Paul Ziegelgrubenstra e 25 D-72810 Gomaringen / DE | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98951406.2 | 15.09.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998EP05869 | Priority number, date | DE19971041466 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19741466 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9916155 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016173 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/24 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H01R43/24 (EP);
H01R43/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES FLACHKABELVERBINDUNGSKAMMES DER IN EIN GEHÄUSE GEGOSSEN WERDEN KANN | [2003/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A FLAT CONNECTOR COMB WHICH CAN BE MOULDED INTO AN ENCLOSURE | [2000/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CONNECTEUR PLAT EN PEIGNE POUVANT ETRE MOULE DANS UN RECEPTACLE | [2000/27] |
Former [2000/27] | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES FLACHKABELVERBINDUNGSKAMMES DER IN EIN GEHAÜSE GEGOSSEN WERDEN KANN | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 25.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0332866 (FELLER AG) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 17; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5074039 (HILLBISH WARREN C ET AL) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5201883 (ATOH KIYOSHI ET AL) [A] 1-3,6,7 * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 1; figure 4 *; | [A]WO8301213 (ASS ENTERPRISES INC) [A] 1-4,7 * page 4, line 1 - line 30; figures 2-5 * |