EP1027526 - EXPANDABLE DOWNHOLE TUBING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METCALFE, Paul, David North Wing, Bucklerburn Steading Peterculter AB14 0NP / GB | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98951576.2 | 02.11.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998GB03261 | Priority number, date | GB19970023031 | 01.11.1997 Original published format: GB 9723031 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9923354 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027526 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027526 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/10 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
E21B43/106 (EP,US);
E21B43/086 (EP,US);
E21B43/103 (EP,US);
E21B43/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/33] | Title | German: | IM BOHRLOCH EXPANDIERBARES STEIGROHR | [2000/33] | English: | EXPANDABLE DOWNHOLE TUBING | [2000/33] | French: | TUBE DE PRODUCTION DE FOND DE TROU EXPANSIBLE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.07.2002 | [2008/16] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3477506 (MALONE BILLY C) [A] 1,9,18,21 * figure - *; | [DA]WO9325800 (SHELL CANADA LTD [CA], et al) [DA] 1,9,18,21 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9800626 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [PA] 1 * figure 1 *; | [PA]US5785120 (SMALLEY MICHAEL TAGUE [US], et al) [PA] 1* abstract * | by applicant | US3353599 | WO9325800 | WO9637681 | WO9717524 | WO9721901 |