blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970730

EP0970730 - GAME MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Sega doing business as Sega Corporation
2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
[2006/17]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD.
2-12, Haneda, 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIMURA, Eiji, Sega Enterprises, Ltd.
2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
02 / MATSUBA, Minoru, Sega Enterprises, Ltd.
2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
03 / HIGASHIGUCHI, Motohiko, Sega Enterprises, Ltd.
2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-0043 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date98951724.806.11.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP05014
Priority number, dateJP1997030624407.11.1997         Original published format: JP 30624497
JP1997035039219.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35039297
JP1998011899728.04.1998         Original published format: JP 11899798
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9924132
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970730
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970730
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.05.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2001
ClassificationIPC:A63G31/02, G09B9/042, G05G5/03, G05G25/00
[2005/40]
CPC:
G05G1/30 (EP,US); A63F13/285 (EP,KR,US); A63F13/245 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/54 (EP,KR); A63F13/57 (EP,KR,US); A63F13/803 (EP,KR,US);
G09B9/04 (EP,US); A63F13/577 (EP,KR); A63F2300/1037 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1062 (EP,KR,US); A63F2300/302 (EP,KR,US); A63F2300/6081 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/64 (EP,KR,US); A63F2300/643 (EP,KR,US); A63F2300/8017 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/02]A63F9/22, A63G31/02, G09B9/042, G05G5/03, G05G25/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:SPIELGERÄT[2000/02]
English:GAME MACHINE[2000/02]
French:MACHINE DE JEU[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.07.1999Translation filed 
29.07.1999National basic fee paid 
29.07.1999Search fee paid 
29.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
13.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2006Fee for grant paid
24.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2297274  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 7 ** page 17, line 2 - line 20 *;
 [XY]US5618178  (COPPERMAN NORMAN S [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15,19-21 * column 7, line 7 - line 26 * * column 9, line 50 - line 59 * * column 10, line 34 - line 54 * * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 14 * * column 14, line 31 - line 53 * * column 16, line 16 - line 21 * * column 17, line 47 - line 67 * [Y] 12,13;
 [X]US5669818  (THORNER CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,19-21 * column 1, line 27 - line 31 * * column 2, line 65 - line 67 * * column 3, line 22 - line 32 * * column 4, line 6 - line 22 * * column 4, line 52 - line 58 *
International search[Y]JPH0159186U  ;
 [X]JPH01130385U  ;
 [X]JPH01150993U  ;
 [X]JPH0397484  (JIYAREKO KK);
 [XP]JPH0346047U  ;
 [Y]JPH0529587U  ;
 [Y]JPH06121818  (AISIN SEIKI, et al);
 [X]JPH07100266  (KONAMI CO LTD);
 [X]JPH08276070  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK);
 [X]JPH09122354  (NAMCO LTD);
 [Y]JPH09231008  (FUJITSU TAKAMIZAWA COMPONENT);
 [YP]JPH1010963  (TOYOTA TSUSHO CORP, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.