EP1019921 - MAGNETORHEOLOGICAL FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Pittsburgh of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education 911 William Pitt Union Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION 911 William Pitt Union Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHULE, Pradeep, P. 231 Kinvara Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98951972.3 | 29.09.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998US20312 | Priority number, date | US19970060296 | 29.09.1997 Original published format: US 60296 | US19980070073 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: US 70073 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9917308 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019921 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/44 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
H01F1/447 (EP,US);
Y10S977/838 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | MAGNETORHEOLOGISCHE FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2000/29] | English: | MAGNETORHEOLOGICAL FLUID | [2000/29] | French: | LIQUIDE MAGNETORHEOLOGIQUE | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9410693 (LORD CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-17 * page 17, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph 2; claims 1,31-39 *; | [X]EP0644253 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11* column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 55; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US4992190 (SHTARKMAN EMIL M [US]); | [Y]US5354488 (SHTARKMAN EMIL M [US], et al); | [Y]US5645752 (WEISS KEITH D [US], et al) |