EP1021923 - A METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT RELATING TO TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMGREN, K., Magnus Viktoriavägen 1 S-191 43 Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
KALLIN, Harald Kruthornsvägen 40 S-192 53 Sollentuna / SE | 03 /
MAGNUSSON, Sverker Jaktvarvsplan 3 S-112 36 Stockholm / SE | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98952021.8 | 29.09.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998US20682 | Priority number, date | US19970939760 | 29.09.1997 Original published format: US 939760 | US19980162123 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: US 162123 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9917574 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021923 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1021923 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/34 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
H04B17/318 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG FÜR EIN TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2001/42] | English: | A METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT RELATING TO TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | [2000/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET MONTAGE POUR SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2000/30] |
Former [2000/30] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG FÜR EIN TELEKOMMUNICATIONSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9629837 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [A] 1,2,8-11,13 * abstract * * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 9 * * page 27, line 14 - line 35 *; | [A]WO9526598 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG ;PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV (NL); PHILIPS NOR) [A] 1,8-11 * page 8, line 2 - line 30 * * page 9, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A]WO9534957 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M ;JOHANSSON BO CHRISTER VILHELM (SE); NAESL) [A] 1,8-11 * page 6, line 10 - line 19 * * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 8 *; | [DA]GB2234142 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [DA] 1,8-11 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 18 - page 5, paragraph 5 * |