30.06.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
02.03.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.11.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.09.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.11.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.04.2003 |
First examination report |
|
10.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.02.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.10.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
04.10.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
04.10.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
06.09.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] |
28.06.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
30.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.01.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
02.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.08.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
09.06.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] |
09.06.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] |
16.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
24.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
11.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|