EP1021657 - EXHAUST PROCESSOR END CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor, Inc. 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2002/33] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Arvin Industries, Inc. One Noblitt Plaza, P.O. Box 3000 Columbus Indiana 47202-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Ronald, S. 3511 Deerfield Place Columbus, IN 47203 / US | 02 /
WADSWORTH, Mick 6 Bowland View, Off Green Lane East Garstang, Lancashire / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2002/43] | Croston, David, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2000/30] | French, Clive Harry, et al Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct, Balm Green Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98952112.5 | 07.10.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998US21083 | Priority number, date | US19970061291P | 07.10.1997 Original published format: US 61291 P | US19970061294P | 07.10.1997 Original published format: US 61294 P | US19980074858P | 17.02.1998 Original published format: US 74858 P | US19980074856P | 17.02.1998 Original published format: US 74856 P | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918358 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021657 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01N7/18, F01N3/28 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
F01N13/1838 (EP,US);
B23P19/04 (EP,US);
B23Q17/20 (EP,US);
F01N13/185 (EP,US);
F01N13/1872 (EP,US);
F01N13/1894 (EP,US);
F01N3/0211 (EP,US);
F01N3/2857 (EP,US);
F01N3/2867 (EP,US);
B23P2700/03 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N2450/02 (EP,US);
F01N2450/20 (EP,US);
F01N2450/22 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S55/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | F15D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | DECKEL FÜR AUSPUFFANLAGE | [2000/30] | English: | EXHAUST PROCESSOR END CAP | [2000/30] | French: | COIFFE D'EXTREMITE POUR PROCESSEUR D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 08.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 13.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3948611 (STAWSKY ALFRED) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 17; figure - *; | [X]GB2020190 (TI SILENCERS LTD) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 33 - line 55; figure 2 *; | [X]DE19636662 (GILLET HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 3; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US1302300 (BRINKMAN LOUIS H [US]); | [Y]US3308853 (O'BRIEN DONALD L); | [A]US3934618 (HENDERSON JAMES R); | [A]US5183299 (HALLERSTROM ROBERT [US], et al) |