Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010024420 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001519365 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU745587B | Global Dossier | 21.03.2002 | B2 | AU1030099 | 03.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1022949 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | EP98952706 | 07.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9813049 | 15.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2305755 | 22.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20001958L | 08.06.2000 | L | NO20001958D0 | 14.04.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ503562 | 31.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL339920 | 15.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6242440 | 05.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9806495 | 07.10.1998 | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9918795 | Global Dossier | 22.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97203227 | 15.10.1997 |