EP1022949 - SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN OXATHIAZINE AND A BENZOTHIOPHENE-2-CARBOXAMIDE-S,S-DIOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | ||
For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE WITTE, Ludo, Antoinnette Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
VALCKE, Alex, Raymond, Albert Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 03 /
VAN DER FLAAS, Mark, Arthur, Josepha Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 04 /
WILLEMS, Willy, Modest, Louisa Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Quaghebeur, Luc, et al Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Quaghebeur, Luc, et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Patent Department, Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 98952706.4 | 07.10.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998EP06495 | Priority number, date | EP19970203227 | 15.10.1997 Original published format: EP 97203227 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918795 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022949 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/88, B27K3/50, // A01N43:88, A01N43:12 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
A01N43/88 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/12 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/88, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/88, A01N43/12 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN EINES OXATHIAZINS UND EINES BENZOTHIOPHEN-2-CARBOXAMID-SS-DIOXIDS | [2000/31] | English: | SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN OXATHIAZINE AND A BENZOTHIOPHENE-2-CARBOXAMIDE-S,S-DIOXIDE | [2000/31] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SYNERGIQUES COMPRENANT UNE OXATHIAZINE ET UN BENZOTHIOPHENE-2-CARBOXAMIDE-S,S-DIOXYDE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4569690 (BROUWER WALTER G [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0512349 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * page 3, line 1 - line 38 * * page 10, line 41 - line 56 ** page 17; example 37 *; | [DA]WO9506043 (UNIROYAL CHEM CO INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * page 1, line 10 - line 22 * * page 24; example 87 *; | [DA]WO9505739 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * page 1, line 7 - page 2, line 9 * * page 8, line 2 - line 36 *; | [A]WO9506091 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 3 - line 7 * * page 3, line 1 - page 15, line 9 *; | [A]DE19548873 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 28 - line 33 * * page 3, line 36 - line 37 * * claim 5 * |