EP1027471 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A COATING BAR FOR USE IN THE PAPER INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG Eclépens S.A. Z.I. Le Village 1312 Eclépens / CH | [2001/31] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states BTG Eclepens S.A. Z.I. Le Village 1312 Eclépens / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRODBECK, Peter Birmannstrasse 4 CH-4410 Liestal / CH | 02 /
CODDET, Christian 19, faubourg de Belfort F-90200 Giromagny / FR | 03 /
HANSZ, Bernard 3, rue du Mont Gargot F-25600 Nommay / FR | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2000/33] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet & Humphrey Avenue du Théâtre 16 Case postale 2065 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 98952800.5 | 27.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998FR02300 | Priority number, date | FR19970013449 | 27.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9713449 | [2000/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9922041 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027471 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027471 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, C23C4/16 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
B05B13/0442 (EP,US);
B05B12/36 (EP,US);
C23C4/12 (EP,US);
C23C4/14 (EP,US);
B05B7/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FI, FR, GB, LI, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | VORRRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES RAKELSTABES VERWENDBAR IN DER PAPIERINDUSTRIE | [2000/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A COATING BAR FOR USE IN THE PAPER INDUSTRY | [2000/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REALISATION D'UNE BARRE DE COUCHAGE UTILISABLE DANS L'INDUSTRIE PAPETIERE | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0376668 ; | [A]US4397893 (BOTTOMS CLIFFORD C [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910620), vol. 015, no. 239, Database accession no. (M - 1126), & JP03076668 A 19910402 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK) [A] * abstract * |