EP0968148 - DIELECTRIC CERAMIC COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUMURA, Hitoshi Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SAITO, Kiyotaka Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
FUJII, Atsuko Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98952982.1 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998IB01870 | Priority number, date | JP19970347053 | 01.12.1997 Original published format: JP 34705397 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928271 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968148 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968148 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/468, H01G4/12 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
H01G4/1227 (EP,US);
C04B35/468 (KR);
C04B35/00 (KR);
C04B35/4682 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/01] | Title | German: | DIELEKTRISCHE KERAMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2000/01] | English: | DIELECTRIC CERAMIC COMPOSITION | [2000/01] | French: | COMPOSITION CERAMIQUE DIELECTRIQUE | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.12.2001 | [2008/16] | Cited in | International search | [A]JP6203630 ; | [A]JP53016899 ; | [A]US5362693 (CHU MIKE S H [US], et al) | [A] - WPI/DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, Accession Number 94-274122, Week 9434; & JP 6203630 A (MURATA MFG CO LTD) 22 July 1994; & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 18, No. 551, 20 October 1994; & JP 6203630 A., & JP6203630 A 19941020 | [A] - WPI/DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, Accession Number 78-24318A, Week 7813; & JP 53016899 A (NICHICON CAPACITOR LTD) 16 February 1978., & JP53016899 A 19780216 |