EP0970965 - CYCLIC PEPTIDES AND MEDICINAL USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Toshiya 20-28-G2, Tsunishi 1-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-0034 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Nobuo 91-1-A202, Sengendai Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0071 / JP | 03 /
TAKESHIGE, Hideyuki 20-1, Kamakurayama 3-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-0031 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Toshiaki 11-24, Numama 1-chome Zushi-shi Kanagawa 249-0004 / JP | 05 /
KAINOH, Mie 663-1-201, Fujisawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0052 / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98953029.0 | 12.11.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998JP05096 | Priority number, date | JP19970311692 | 13.11.1997 Original published format: JP 31169297 | [2000/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925731 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970965 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0970965 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/64, A61K38/12 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
C07K14/70542 (EP,US);
C07K14/7055 (EP,US);
C07K7/54 (EP,US);
C07K7/64 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/02] | Title | German: | ZYKLISCHE PEPTIDE UND MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2000/02] | English: | CYCLIC PEPTIDES AND MEDICINAL USE THEREOF | [2000/02] | French: | PEPTIDES CYCLIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION MEDICINALE | [2000/02] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2000/16: A request for correction of the description and claims was filed under Rule 88 EPC. The applicant has subsequently filed a sequence listing and declared that it includes no new matter. | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1999 | Translation filed | 12.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 12.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/13] | 22.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9600581 (TEXAS BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO9601644 (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) |