EP1035568 - Method of plasma processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/37] | METHOD OF PLASMA PROCESSING | ||
[2006/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [2006/35] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Tokyo Electron Limited 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKIAGE, Noriaki, 103, Tokyo Electron Sakuragaokaryo, 1-56-1, Sakuragaoka Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0013 / JP | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98953048.0 | 13.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998JP05131 | Priority number, date | JP19970336294 | 20.11.1997 Original published format: JP 33629497 | [2000/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927574 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035568 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035568 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/314, H01L21/768, H01L23/532 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
C23C16/56 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/30 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0212 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0228 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3105 (EP,US);
H01L21/3127 (US);
H01L21/76826 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/76829 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/76801 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/37] | H01L21/314, H01L21/312 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT [2000/37] | Title | German: | Plasma-Verfahren | [2006/17] | English: | Method of plasma processing | [2006/17] | French: | Procédé de traitement au plasma | [2006/17] |
Former [2000/37] | PLASMA-VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2000/37] | METHOD OF PLASMA PROCESSING | ||
Former [2000/37] | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2000 | Translation filed | 19.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.08.2006 | FR | 30.08.2006 | IT | 30.08.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | BE | 30.08.2006 | |
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | BE | 30.08.2006 | |
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | BE | 30.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS5698469 ; | [A]JPH05234987 ; | [XAY]EP0696819 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 16 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 43; figure 1 * * column 6, line 58 - column 8, line 15; figure 3 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 15 * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 27 * [A] 7,10,11 [Y] 5,6; | [A]EP0701283 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4,7-9 * column 3, line 3 - line 30; figures 1A,1B * * page 4, line 48 - page 6, line 28 * * page 7, line 51 - page 8, line 37; figure 2 * * page 9, line 31 - line 51; figures 9,10 * * page 11, line 1 - line 20 * * page 13, line 20 - page 14, line 3; figures 19-21 * * page 14, line 16 - line 51; figure 24 ** page 15, line 36 - page 16, line 7 *; | [XAY]EP0794569 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 26 * * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 13 * * page 6, line 45 - page 7, line 14 * [A] 7-11 [Y] 5,6; | [E]EP0933802 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]) [E] 1,3,6 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 34; figures 1,2A-2D * * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 13; figure 5 * * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 8; figures 6A-7C * * column 8, line 47 - line 55 *; | [E]EP1028457 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5,7,8,10 * column 1, line 39 - column 3, line 1; figure 8 * * column 3, line 31 - column 6, line 37; figures 1,2A-2C,3A,3B,4,5 * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 17 *; | [XA] - FRANCZ G ET AL, "PHOTOELECTRON SPECTROSCOPY OF ION-IRRADIATED BETA-DOPED CVD DIAMOND SURFACES", THIN SOLID FILMS,CH,ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, (1995), vol. 270, no. 1/02, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 200 - 204, XP002916383 [X] 1,2 * page 201, paragraph 2 * [A] 3,4,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(95)06916-X | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811027), vol. 005, no. 168, Database accession no. (C - 077), & JP56098469 A 19810807 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 7-9 | [YA] - ENDO K ET AL, "PREPARATION AND PROPERTIES OF FLUORINATED AMORPHOUS CARBON THIN FILMS BY PLASMA ENHANCED CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, (19950417), XP000574675 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 7-9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931216), vol. 017, no. 687, Database accession no. (E - 1478), & JP05234987 A 19930910 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-4,7-9 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH06333916 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0864591 (IBM); | [A]JPH08222557 (NEC CORP); | [Y] - FRANCZ G., ET AL., "PHOTOELECTRON SPECTROSCOPY OF ION-IRRADIATED BETA-DOPED CVD DIAMOND SURFACES.", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE., CH, CH, (19950101), vol. 270., no. 01/02., doi:10.1016/0040-6090(95)06916-X, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 200 - 204., XP002916383 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(95)06916-X |