EP0956508 - ICAM-4 AND DIAGNOSTIC USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICOS CORPORATION 22021 20th Avenue, S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILGANNON, Patrick, D. 10152 N.E. 204 Street Bothell, WA 98011 / US | 02 /
GALLATIN, W., Michael 8412 S.E. 33rd Place Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Richardson, Kate Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Richardson, Kate Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98953249.4 | 02.10.1998 | [1999/46] | WO1998US20876 | Priority number, date | US19970942867 | 02.10.1997 Original published format: US 942867 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918441 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956508 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956508 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, // C07K16:28 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP);
C07K16/2821 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/30 (EP);
C12N2799/026 (EP);
G01N2333/70525 (EP);
G01N2800/2821 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | ICAM-4 UND DESSEN DIAGNOSTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN | [1999/46] | English: | ICAM-4 AND DIAGNOSTIC USES THEREOF | [1999/46] | French: | ICAM-4 ET SES UTILISATIONS DIAGNOSTIQUES | [1999/46] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03008188.9 / EP1338896 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 09.07.2003 | PT | 09.07.2003 | CY | 02.10.2003 | LU | 02.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | GR | 09.07.2003 | |
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 02.10.2003 | ||
LU | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | GR | 09.07.2003 | |
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 09.07.2003 | |
PT | 09.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [PA]WO9222323 (CENTER FOR BLOOD RESEARCH) [PA] 1-17 * example - * * claim - * | Examination | WO9640916 |