Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1021304 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2004 | A4 | EP1021304 | 26.07.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9821004 | 07.10.1998 | US6161097 | 10.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2306248 | 04.01.2005 | C | CA2306248 | 22.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9821004 | 07.10.1998 | US6161097 | 10.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6073346 | 13.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16779198 | 07.10.1998 | US6161097 | 10.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6227591 | 08.05.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US16779198 | 07.10.1998 | US6161097 | 10.10.1997 | US46510799 | 16.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9919155 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1999 | B1 | WO9919155 | 08.07.1999 | A3 | WO9919155 | 22.04.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6161097 | 10.10.1997 |