EP1021304 - DUAL ALLOY RAILROAD WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULTRACLAD CORPORATION 155 River Street Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | [2000/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUNKLE, Joseph, C. 3 Plum Hill Manchester-by-the-Sea, MA 01944 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Casey, Lindsay Joseph FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 98953268.4 | 07.10.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998US21004 | Priority number, date | US19970061610P | 10.10.1997 Original published format: US 61610 P | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9919155 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1021304 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60B1/00 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
B60B17/0068 (EP,US);
B60B17/0006 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | SCHIENENRAD AUS ZWEI LEGIERUNGEN | [2000/30] | English: | DUAL ALLOY RAILROAD WHEEL | [2000/30] | French: | ROUE DE VEHICULE FERROVIERE A DEUX ALLIAGES | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1603318 (RAYCHEM CORP) [X] 1,9,17 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE723420 (GUSTAV SEMBDNER) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - * | International search | [X]US950500 (WOODS LEONARD G [US]) |