EP1024811 - NOVEL BENZODIAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AS ANTIARRHYTHMIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIVERTON, Nigel, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
BUTCHER, John, W. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
CLAREMON, David, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 04 /
SELNICK, Harold, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98953453.2 | 13.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US21597 | Priority number, date | US19970062833P | 17.10.1997 Original published format: US 62833 P | GB19980006686 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9806686 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920281 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024811 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/55, C07D243/24 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
C07D243/14 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
C07D243/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Extension states | AL | 17.05.2000 | LT | 17.05.2000 | LV | 17.05.2000 | MK | 17.05.2000 | RO | 17.05.2000 | SI | 17.05.2000 | Title | German: | NEUE BENZODIAZEPINDERIVATE ALS ANTIARRHYTHMISCHE MITTEL | [2000/32] | English: | NOVEL BENZODIAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AS ANTIARRHYTHMIC AGENTS | [2000/32] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE BENZODIAZEPINE S'UTILISANT COMME AGENTS ANTI-ARYTHMISANTS | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 10.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 29.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YP]US5817658 (SIEGL PETER K S [US], et al); | [YP]WO9748686 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [YP]US5776930 (LYNCH JR JOSEPH J [US], et al); | [Y]US5633251 (CLAREMON DAVID A [US], et al); | [Y]US5597818 (SANGUINETTI MICHAEL C [US], et al); | [Y]US5426185 (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al); | [Y]US5004741 (EVANS BEN E [US], et al); | [Y]US4994258 (BURNS H DONALD [US], et al); | [Y]US4628084 (BOCK MARK G [US], et al) | [YP] - SELNICK H G, ET AL., "CLASS III ANTIARRHYTHMIC ACTIVITY IN VIVO BY SELECTIVE BLOCKADE OF THE SLOWLY ACTIVATING CARDIAC DELAYED RECTIFIER POTASSIUM CURRENT IKS BY (R)-2-(2,4-TRIFLUOROMETHYL)-N-¬2-OXO-5-PHENYL- 1-(2,2,2-TRIFLUOROETHYL)-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-BENZO¬E3⁄4¬1,43⁄4DIAZEPIN-3-YL3⁄4ACETAMIDE", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19971107), vol. 40, no. 23, doi:10.1021/jm970517u, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3865 - 3868, XP002916243 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970517u | [Y] - TOKARSKI J S, HOPFINGER A J, "THREE-DIMENSIONAL MOLECULAR SHAPE ANALYSIS-QUANTITATIVE STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIP OF A SERIES OF CHOLECYSTOKININ-A RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19941014), vol. 37, no. 21, doi:10.1021/jm00047a021, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3639 - 3654, XP002916244 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00047a021 | [Y] - BUREAU R, RAULT S, ROBBA M, "COMPARATIVE MOLECULAR FIELD ANALYSIS OF CCK-B ANTAGONISTS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS., FR, FR, (19940101), vol. 29, no. 06, doi:10.1016/0223-5234(94)90076-0, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 487 - 494, XP002916245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0223-5234(94)90076-0 |