Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1047761
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.10.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
31.05.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
04.12.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
15.09.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] |
15.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] |
08.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|