EP1047761 - HARD SURFACE CLEANING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MID-CHAIN BRANCHED SURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINSON, Phillip, Kyle 5803 Windermere Lane Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 02 /
CRIPE, Thomas, Anthony 599 Three Chimneys Lane Loveland, OH 45140-7345 / US | 03 /
MORELLI, Joseph, Paul 541 Howell Street Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | 04 /
STIDHAM, Robert, Emerson 20377 Georgetown Road Lawrenceburg, IN 47025 / US | 05 /
CONNOR, Daniel, Stedman 9217 Sagemeadow Drive Cincinnati, OH 45251 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 98953461.5 | 14.10.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998US21615 | Priority number, date | US19970061970P | 14.10.1997 Original published format: US 61970 P | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919448 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047761 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/00, C11D17/04, C11D1/83, C11D1/94 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
C11D1/10 (EP);
C11D1/37 (EP);
C11D1/825 (EP);
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D1/94 (EP);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D3/0036 (EP);
C11D3/2068 (EP);
C11D3/3776 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP);
C11D1/721 (EP);
C11D1/88 (EP);
C11D1/90 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | SEITENKETTIGE TENSIDE ENTHALTENDE SPÜLWASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR HARTE OBERFLÄCHEN | [2000/44] | English: | HARD SURFACE CLEANING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MID-CHAIN BRANCHED SURFACTANTS | [2000/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE DE SURFACES DURES, COMPRENANT DES TENSIOACTIFS RAMIFIES A CHAINE MOYENNE | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 01.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/48] | 05.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.06.2000 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | 29.06.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.06.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   25.07.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PA]WO9738956 (CONNOR DANIEL STEDMAN ;PROCTER & GAMBLE (US)) [PA] 3,10,11 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 13; example III; claims 1-8 * * page 6, line 26 - line 31 * * page 7, line 29 - line 34 *; | [PA]EP0859045 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [PA] 1,2 * examples A,B,J; claims 1,4,16 *; | [AD]WO9701521 (SASTECH PTY LTD ;SASOL CHEMICALS EUROP LTD (GB); BETTS MARK JUSTIN) [AD] 1,10,11 * example 13 *; | [A]WO9604358 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 5,12,13 * example IV; claims 1-11 *; | [A]WO9729084 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 4 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0357496 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 8 * page 3, line 31 - line 41; claim - *; | [PA]WO9811813 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [PA] 8 * page 19, paragraph 3 - page 20, paragraph 2 * | [AD] - VARADARJA R ET AL, "RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN DYNAMIC CONTACT ANGLE AND DYNAMIC SURFACE TENSION PROPERTIES FOR LIANER AND BRANCHED ETHOXYLATE, ETHOXYSULFATE, AND SULFATE SURFACTANTS", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (199112), vol. 147, no. 2, pages 403 - 406, XP000602370 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9797(91)90173-6 | [AD] - VARADARAJ R ET AL, "RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN FUNDAMENTAL INTERFACIAL PROPERTIES AND FOAMING IN LINEAR AND BRANCED SULFATE, ETHOXYSULFATE, AND ETHOXYLATE SURFACTANTS", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (199011), vol. 140, no. 1, pages 31 - 34, XP002036586 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9797(90)90317-H |