EP1042932 - A METHOD FOR UPLINK POWER CONTROL FOR DISTRIBUTED SATELLITE NETWORKS TO COMPENSATE FOR RAIN FADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ViaSat, Inc. 6155 El Camino Real Carlsbad, CA 92009-1699 / US | [2006/02] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Viasat, Inc. 6155 El Camino Real Carlsbad, CA 92009-1699 / US | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states COMSAT Corporation 6560 Rock Spring Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGARWAL, Anil, K. 409 Midsummer Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 02 /
HARIHARAN, Moorthy, N. 12109 Skip Jack Drive Germantown, MD 20874 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Raffnsoee, Knud Rosenstand Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Raffnsoee, Knud Rosenstand Internationalt Patent-Bureau Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 98953469.8 | 20.10.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US21632 | Priority number, date | US19970064673P | 20.10.1997 Original published format: US 64673 P | US19970062496P | 20.10.1997 Original published format: US 62496 P | US19970062497P | 20.10.1997 Original published format: US 62497 P | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9921378 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042932 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042932 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20, H04B7/185 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
H04B7/2125 (EP,US);
H04B7/18513 (EP,US);
H04B7/18543 (EP,US);
H04B7/208 (EP,US);
H04L1/0083 (EP,US);
H04W52/28 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0007 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/41] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/41] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSREGELUNGSVERFAHREN IN EINER AUFWÄRTSVERBINDUNG IN VERTEILTEN SATELLITENNETZWERKEN UM REGENFADING AUSZUGLEICHEN | [2000/41] | English: | A METHOD FOR UPLINK POWER CONTROL FOR DISTRIBUTED SATELLITE NETWORKS TO COMPENSATE FOR RAIN FADE | [2000/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE LA PUISSANCE D'UNE VOIE ASCENDANTE POUR RESEAUX A SATELLITES DISTRIBUES DESTINE A COMPENSER UN FADING DU A LA PLUIE | [2005/34] |
Former [2000/41] | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE ASCENDANTE POUR RESEAUX A SATELLITE DISTRIBUE DESTINE A COMPENSER UN MANQUE DU A LA PLUIE | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 19.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0428099 (NOKIA OY AB [FI]) [A] 1-18* abstract * | International search | [Y]US4910792 (TAKAHATA FUMIO [JP], et al); | [A]US4941199 (SAAM THOMAS J [US]); | [Y]US5241690 (LARSSON STIG M [SE], et al); | [Y]US5386589 (KANAI TOSHIHITO [JP]); | [A]US5465399 (OBERHOLTZER JOHN C [US], et al); | [Y]US5504776 (YAMAURA TOMOYA [JP], et al); | [YP]US5697056 (TAYLOE DANIEL RICHARD [US]); | [AP]US5768684 (GRUBB JERROLD LEE [US], et al) |