EP1027709 - ELECTRONICALLY-CONDUCTIVE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABINEC, Susan, J. 1110 West Park Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
DRUMRIGHT, Ray, E. 785 East Olson Road Midland, MI 48640 / US | 03 /
SEN, Ashish 210 Burning Bush Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98953480.5 | 14.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US21661 | Priority number, date | US19970062047P | 15.10.1997 Original published format: US 62047 P | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919883 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027709 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/12, C08G73/02 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
H01B1/127 (EP,US);
H01B1/12 (KR);
C08G61/122 (EP,US);
H01B1/128 (EP,US);
H01G11/48 (EP,US);
H01G11/56 (EP,US);
Y02E60/13 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGE POLYMERE | [2000/33] | English: | ELECTRONICALLY-CONDUCTIVE POLYMERS | [2000/33] | French: | POLYMERES ELECTRONIQUEMENT CONDUCTEURS | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0591951 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,10,11,18,19,21,23-25,27 * examples 18-31 *; | [X]JPH05262981 ; | [X]EP0409124 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11,23 * column 2, line 32 - line 43; example 6 *; | [X]WO9518453 (NESTE OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4,10-14,30 * example 2 *; | [DA]US5378404 (HAN CHIEN-CHUNG [US], et al) [DA] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5378402 (CROSS MALCOLM G [GB], et al) [DA] 1-33 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 45, Database accession no. 93-357327, XP002094240 & JPH05262981 A 19931012 (JAPAN CARLIT CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,10,11,18,19,22 * abstract * |