EP1025184 - ENHANCED DYE DURABILITY THROUGH CONTROLLED DYE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRERA, Denise, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HARELSTAD, Roberta, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
JOSEPH, William, D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
PAVELKA, Lee, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MI 55133-3427 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98953680.0 | 19.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US22001 | Priority number, date | US19970957291 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: US 957291 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9921937 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025184 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1025184 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, C08F283/00, C08L51/08, C09D5/00, C09B67/00, C08K5/46 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F283/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F283/004 (EP,US);
C08F283/006 (EP,US);
C08F283/02 (EP,US);
C08G18/38 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4879 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08K5/46 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D151/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/004 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L75/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09D151/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/32] | Title | German: | ERHÖHTE FARBSTOFFHALTBARKEIT DURCH KONTROLLIERTE FARBSTOFFUMGEBUNG | [2000/32] | English: | ENHANCED DYE DURABILITY THROUGH CONTROLLED DYE ENVIRONMENT | [2000/32] | French: | DURABILITE AMELIOREE DE COLORANTS PAR MODIFICATION DE LEUR ENVIRONNEMENT | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52] | Request for further processing for: | 18.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.01.2004 | [2008/16] | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0273583 (SEQUA CORP [US]) [X] 21 * abstract * * example 9 * * claim - * [A] 1-22; | [XA]WO9511464 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,21 * abstract * * page 16, line 26 - line 35 * * page 21, line 8 - line 17 * * page 24, line 13 - line 19 * * page 47, line 16 - line 20 * * example 2 * * claims 1-15 * [A] 1-22; | [A]WO9712000 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract ** page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 9 *; | [XA] - AKAY M ET AL, "EXAMINATION OF GLASS-TRANSITION IN A PU/PMMA SEQUENTIAL IPN", POLYMERS AT LOW TEMPERATURES.;LONDON, ENGL, 1987 Plastics & Rubber Inst, Engl, (1987), pages 10. 1 - 10. 11, XP002091670 [X] 21 * abstract * [A] 1-22 |