EP0950008 - ROTATABLE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REMOVING WIRE FROM A BALE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAMB-GRAYS HARBOR CO. Blaine and Firman Streets, P.O. Box 359 Hoquiam Washington 98550-0359 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states LAMB-GRAYS HARBOR CO. Blaine and Firman Streets, P.O. Box 359 Hoquiam, Washington 98550-0359 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERRILL, Stanley, R. 222 Ocean Beach Road Hoquiam, WA 98550 / US | 02 /
HAWLEY, Michael, E. 525 Westhill Avenue Beaconsfield, Quebec H9W 2G5 / CA | 03 /
DALIETOS, Paul Apartment 1825, 2827 Windsor Lane S.W. Tumwater, WA 98512 / US | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98953789.9 | 21.10.1998 | [1999/42] | WO1998US22191 | Priority number, date | US19970962226 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: US 962226 | [1999/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9922992 | Date: | 14.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0950008 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950008 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
B65B69/0025 (EP,US);
Y10S83/909 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49821 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5139 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/42] | Title | German: | DREHBARE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON DRÄHTEN EINES BALLENS | [1999/42] | English: | ROTATABLE APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REMOVING WIRE FROM A BALE | [1999/42] | French: | MACHINE ROTATIVE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RETIRER LE CABLE D'UNE BALLE | [1999/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 19.05.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01103461.8 / EP1103469 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2001 | [2003/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0251414 (UITERT SPEC MASCHF VAN [NL]) [A] 1,6,14* column 4, line 16 - column 7, line 44; figure - *; | [YA]EP0281942 (B & G FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 14,16 * column 5, line 36 - column 8, line 32; figure - * [A] 1,2,10,11; | [Y]WO9213768 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR IND AB [SE]) [Y] 14,16 * page 2, line 24 - page 5, line 26; figure - *; | [A]WO9317916 (JP PROJEKTTEKNIK AB [SE]) [A] 1,6,11,14 * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 26; figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]EP0251414 (UITERT SPEC MASCHF VAN [NL]) [A] 1,6,14* column 4, line 16 - column 7, line 44; figure - *; | [YA]EP0281942 (B & G FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 14,16 * column 5, line 36 - column 8, line 32; figure - * [A] 1,2,10,11; | [Y]WO9213768 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR IND AB [SE]) [Y] 14,16 * page 2, line 24 - page 5, line 26; figure - *; | [A]WO9317916 (JP PROJEKTTEKNIK AB [SE]) [A] 1,6,11,14 * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 26; figure -; claim - * |