Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0950008
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
09.08.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
17.08.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] |
21.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2001 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
12.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.10.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
12.07.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.03.2000 |
First examination report |
|
28.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.02.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
04.02.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
03.09.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
03.09.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
29.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|