Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1103469 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98953789 | 21.10.1998 | US96222697 | 31.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1106899 | Global Dossier | 24.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US96222697 | 31.10.1997 | US9822191 | 21.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0950008 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2001 | B1 | EP0950008 | 20.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96222697 | 31.10.1997 | US9822191 | 21.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE206377T | 15.10.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US96222697 | 31.10.1997 | US9822191 | 21.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69801892T | 25.04.2002 | T2 | DE69801892D1 | 08.11.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US96222697 | 31.10.1997 | US9822191 | 21.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6047458 | 11.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US22401998 | 31.12.1998 | US96222697 | 31.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9922992 | Global Dossier | 14.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96222697 | 31.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6115904 | 12.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US96222697 | 31.10.1997 | Type | Divisional application | EP1103469 |