EP1040444 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECOVERY OF QUANTIZATION CODES IN A LOSSY TRANSMISSION ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONY ELECTRONICS, INC. 1 Sony Drive, MD T1-1 Park Ridge, NJ 07656-8003 / US | [2010/32] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Sony Electronics Inc. 1 Sony Drive, MD T1-1 Park Ridge, NJ 07656-8003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Tetsujiro 12-1255 1-14, Tsumadakita Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-Prefecture 243 / JP | 02 /
CARRIG, James, J. 1555 Minnesota Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 03 /
FUJIMORI, Yasuhiro 11693 Westshore Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
GHOSAL, Sugata 1559 Birchmeadow Court San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98953950.7 | 23.10.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998US22531 | Priority number, date | US19970956632 | 23.10.1997 Original published format: US 956632 | US19970956870 | 23.10.1997 Original published format: US 956870 | US19970957555 | 23.10.1997 Original published format: US 957555 | US19980002553 | 02.01.1998 Original published format: US 2553 | US19980002547 | 02.01.1998 Original published format: US 2547 | US19980002470 | 02.01.1998 Original published format: US 2470 | US19980016083 | 30.01.1998 Original published format: US 16083 | US19980111116 | 06.07.1998 Original published format: US 111116 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9921125 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040444 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040444 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/36, G06K9/46, G06K9/38, H04N7/64, H04N7/68, H04N7/26 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
H04N19/59 (EP);
H04N19/88 (EP);
H04N19/89 (EP);
H04N19/895 (EP);
H04N19/98 (EP);
H04N21/426 (EP);
H04N5/21 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/40] | G06K9/36, G06K9/46, G06K9/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON QUANTISIERUNGSKODEN IN EINER VERLUSTBEHAFTETEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSUMGEBUNG | [2010/15] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECOVERY OF QUANTIZATION CODES IN A LOSSY TRANSMISSION ENVIRONMENT | [2000/40] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION DE CODES DE QUANTIFICATION DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE TRANSMISSION A PERTES | [2000/40] |
Former [2000/40] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON QUNATISIERUNGSKODEN IN EINER VERLUSTBEHAFTETEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSUMGEBUNG | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2010 | BE | 11.08.2010 | CY | 11.08.2010 | DK | 11.08.2010 | IT | 11.08.2010 | SE | 11.08.2010 | IE | 23.10.2010 | LU | 23.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | GR | 12.11.2010 | ES | 22.11.2010 | PT | 13.12.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/47] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 23.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0707425 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * column 5, line 36 - column 8, line 48 *; | [X] - MATSUMURA Y ET AL, "SELF-SYNCHRONIZED SYNTAX FOR ERROR-RESILIENT VIDEO CODING", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (199610), vol. E79B, no. 10, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 1467 - 1473, XP000636089 [X] 1-34 * page 1469, column R, paragraph 4.2 - page 1471, column L, paragraph 5 * | International search | [X] - GONZALEZ R.C. et al., "Digital Image Processing", ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, INC., 1992, pages 346-348. | [X] - ARAVIND R. et al., "Image and Video Coding Standards", AT&T TECHNICAL JOURNAL, Jan./Feb. 1993, pages 67-88. | by applicant | US4722003 | US4845560 |