EP0946830 - FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUOFF, Manfred Hohenstaufenstrasse 19 D-71696 Möglingen / DE | 02 /
HARNDORF, Horst Auenweg 25 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [1999/40] | Application number, filing date | 98954191.7 | 18.09.1998 | [1999/40] | WO1998DE02771 | Priority number, date | DE1997146492 | 22.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19746492 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920893 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946830 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946830 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02M43/00, F02M43/02, F02M47/02 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
F02M43/04 (EP,US);
F02M43/00 (EP,KR,US);
F02M43/02 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M2200/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/40] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZANLAGE FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [1999/40] | English: | FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1999/40] | French: | SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Request for further processing for: | 22.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5848771 ; | [A]DE4407052 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE4341739 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 7; figure . *; | [DA]DE4337048 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 29; figure . *; | [A]DE19523878 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]US5671717 (REMBOLD HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 27 - column 6, line 23; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830610), vol. 007, no. 133, Database accession no. (M - 221), & JP58048771 A 19830322 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4337048 |