EP1044052 - A FILTER HAVING A CLEANING NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simatek A/S Stationsvej 3 4490 Jerslev S. / DK | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Arne, Gronbaek Bakkendrupvej 38 DK-4480 St. Fuglede / DK | 02 /
CHRISTENSEN, Keld Hybenvej 19 DK-4291 Ruds Vedby / DK | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Sundien, Thomas, et al Hofman-Bang A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 98954242.8 | 10.11.1998 | [2000/42] | WO1998DK00483 | Priority number, date | DK19230000974 | 10.11.1997 Original published format: DK 97423 | [2000/42] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9924146 | Date: | 20.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044052 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1044052 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/04 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
B01D46/04 (EP,US);
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/2411 (EP,US);
B01D46/4272 (EP,US);
B01D46/71 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | FILTER MIT REINIGUNGSDÜSE | [2000/42] | English: | A FILTER HAVING A CLEANING NOZZLE | [2000/42] | French: | FILTRE MUNI D'UNE BUSE DE NETTOYAGE | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1998 | Translation filed | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 05.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0719577 (INTENSIV FILTER GMBH [DE]) |