Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4202598B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2008 | B2 | JP2001522712 | 20.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 | DK9800483 | 10.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU738932B | Global Dossier | 27.09.2001 | B2 | AU1144099 | 31.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 | DK9800483 | 10.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1044052 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2004 | B1 | EP1044052 | 18.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 | DK9800483 | 10.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69824633T | 30.06.2005 | T2 | DE69824633D1 | 22.07.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 | DK9800483 | 10.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1044052T | 19.07.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 | DK9800483 | 10.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ504251 | 28.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 | DK9800483 | 10.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6340383 | 22.01.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 | DK9800483 | 10.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9924146 | Global Dossier | 20.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK9700423U | 12.03.1999 | U3 | Priority number | Date | DK9700423 | 10.11.1997 |