EP1014792 - SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IMAZALIL AND EPOXICONAZOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSSELAERS, Jan, Pieter, Hendrik Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.,Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
GARNIER, Alain, Joseph, Jean, Florimond Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.,Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | [2000/27] | Application number, filing date | 98954263.4 | 01.09.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998EP05711 | Priority number, date | EP19970202760 | 08.09.1997 Original published format: EP 97202760 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9912422 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014792 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014792 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/653 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
A01N43/653 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/653, A01N43/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Extension states | AL | 10.04.2000 | LT | 10.04.2000 | LV | 10.04.2000 | MK | 10.04.2000 | RO | 10.04.2000 | SI | 10.04.2000 | Title | German: | IMAZALIL UND EPOXICONAZOL BEINHALTENDE SYNERGISTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2000/27] | English: | SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IMAZALIL AND EPOXICONAZOLE | [2000/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SYNERGIQUES COMPRENANT DE L'IMAZALIL ET DE L'EPOXYCONAZOLE | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 28.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2003 | BE | 04.06.2003 | CH | 04.06.2003 | FI | 04.06.2003 | FR | 04.06.2003 | IT | 04.06.2003 | LI | 04.06.2003 | NL | 04.06.2003 | CY | 01.09.2003 | IE | 01.09.2003 | LU | 01.09.2003 | DK | 04.09.2003 | GB | 04.09.2003 | GR | 04.09.2003 | PT | 04.09.2003 | SE | 04.09.2003 | DE | 05.09.2003 | ES | 15.09.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
FR | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
IE | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GB | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
IE | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GB | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
IE | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 04.06.2003 | |
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0336489 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) |