EP1029060 - CHIMERIC HYDROXY-PHENYL PYRUVATE DIOXYGENASE, DNA SEQUENCE AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING PLANTS CONTAINING SUCH A GENE, WITH HERBICIDE TOLERANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer SAS 16, rue Jean-Marie Leclair 69009 Lyon / FR | [2010/44] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience S.A. 55, avenue René Cassin 69009 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience S.A. 55, avenue René-Cassin 69009 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A. 55, avenue René Cassin 69009 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUDEC, Philippe 7, rue Camille de Neuville F-69009 Lyon / FR | 02 /
BOURDON, Hélène 8, allée des Tullistes F-69130 Ecully / FR | 03 /
DUMAS, Florence 3, rue de la Pécherie F-69250 Fleurieu sur Saône / FR | 04 /
RODGERS, Matthew Rhône-Poulenc Agriculture Ltd., Fyfield Road Ongar, Essex CM5 0HW / GB | 05 /
SAILLAND, Alain 38, rue Albert Chalinel F-69009 Lyon / FR | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Monconduit, Hervé, et al Bayer S.A.S. Bayer CropScience Patents & Licensing Department Centre R & D La Dargoire, 14 Impasse Pierre Baizet, BP 99163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Monconduit, Hervé, et al Bayer S.A.S. Bayer CropScience Patents & Licensing Department Centre R & D La Dargoire 14 Impasse Pierre Baizet BP 99163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/31] | Guitton, Carole, et al Bayer CropScience SA Patents & Licensing Department 14-20 rue Pierre Baizet - BP9163 69263 Lyon cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2007/24] | Monconduit, Hervé, et al Bayer CropScience SA Département Brevets et Licences 14-20 rue Pierre Baizet BP 9163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/06] | Nowak, Alexander Bayer CropScience S.A. Département Brevets et Licences 14-20, rue Pierre Baizet B.P. 9163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/02] | Mérigeault, Shona, et al Aventis CropScience SA Département Propriété Industrielle 14-20 rue Pierre Baizet B.P. 9163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2000/34] | Tetaz, Franck, et al Aventis CropScience SA Département Propriété Industrielle BP 9163 69263 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98954544.7 | 09.11.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998FR02391 | Priority number, date | FR19970014264 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: FR 9714264 | [2000/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9924586 | Date: | 20.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029060 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029060 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/53, C12N15/62, C12N15/82, C12N5/10, C12N9/02, A01H5/00, A01H5/10 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
C12N9/0069 (EP);
C12N15/8274 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE HYDROXYPHENYLPYRUVATDIOXYGENASE, DNA SEQUENZ UND HERBIZIDTOLERANTE PFLANZEN, DIE EIN SOLCHES GEN BESITZEN | [2000/34] | English: | CHIMERIC HYDROXY-PHENYL PYRUVATE DIOXYGENASE, DNA SEQUENCE AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING PLANTS CONTAINING SUCH A GENE, WITH HERBICIDE TOLERANCE | [2000/34] | French: | HYDROXY-PHENYL PYRUVATE DIOXYGENASE CHIMERE, SEQUENCE D'ADN ET OBTENTION DE PLANTES CONTENANT UN TEL GENE, TOLERANTES AUX HERBICIDES | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.01.2010
19.04.2011
WITHDRAWN SYNGENTA INTERNATIONAL AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.01.2010
19.04.2011
WITHDRAWN SYNGENTA INTERNATIONAL AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.01.2010
02.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE SYNGENTA INTERNATIONAL AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.01.2010
SYNGENTA INTERNATIONAL AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 D-80331 München / DE | 09.03.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.09.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 19.11.2011 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.04.2009 | CY | 29.04.2009 | DK | 29.04.2009 | FI | 29.04.2009 | IE | 29.04.2009 | IT | 29.04.2009 | NL | 29.04.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.07.2009 | ES | 09.08.2009 | PT | 29.08.2009 | LU | 09.11.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
LU | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0252666 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]WO9632484 (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [A] 1-26 * voir le document en entier, préf. p.12 l.9-14 *; | [AD]WO9638567 (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9727285 (UNIV ARIZONA [US]) [A] 1-44 * the whole document *; | [A] - LEE M. ET AL., "The C-terminal of rat 4-hydroxyphenylpyruvate dioxygenase is indispensable for enzyme activity", FEBS LETTERS, (19960916), vol. 393, no. 2,3, pages 269 - 272, XP002070559 [A] 1-26 * voir le document en entier, préf. p. 270 col. droite 2. par. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(96)00902-7 | [A] - GARCIA I. ET AL., "Subcellular localization and purification of a p-hydroxyphenylpyruvate dioxygenase from cultured carrot cells and characterization of the corresponding cDNA", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1997 AUG 1) 325 ( PT 3) 761-9. JOURNAL CODE: 9YO. ISSN: 0264-6021., XP002070560 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * |