EP1030743 - CARBON REMOVAL APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For:IE
Perry, June Annie Lynch Villa 227, Philip Holzmann Riyadh / SA | For:IE
Grime Reaper Products Ltd. 90 Nelson Lane Warrick, CB34 5JB / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
GR-Europe b.v. Rooswijkweg 68 1951 MJ Velsen-noord / NL | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/35] | For:IE
Perry, June Annie Lynch Villa 227, Philip Holzmann Riyadh / SA | ||
For:IE
Grime Reaper Products Ltd. 90 Nelson Lane Warrick, CB34 5JB / GB | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
GR-Europe b.v. Rooswijkweg 68 1951 MJ Velsen-noord / NL | |||
Former [2002/03] | For:GB
IE
Perry, June Annie Lynch Villa 227, Philip Holzmann Riyadh / SA | ||
For:GB
IE
Grime Reaper Products Ltd. 90 Nelson Lane Warrick, CB34 5JB / GB | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
GR-Europe b.v. Rooswijkweg 68 1951 MJ Velsen-noord / NL | |||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Cochrane-Murray, Josephine Emily 33 Rockhaven Road Cowies Hill, Near Durban 3610 / ZA | ||
For all designated states Perry, June Annie Lynch Villa 227, Philip Holzmann Riyadh / SA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRY, June, Annie, Lynch Villa 227, Philip Holzmann Riyadh / SA | 02 /
PERRY, Jonathon Villa 227, Philip Holzmann Riyadh / SA | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Croston, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Croston, David, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98954587.6 | 13.11.1998 | [2000/35] | WO1998GB03423 | Priority number, date | GB19970023970 | 14.11.1997 Original published format: GB 9723970 | GB19980014721 | 08.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9814721 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925492 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030743 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030743 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/04 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
B08B3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/34] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON KOHLENSTOFF | [2000/35] | English: | CARBON REMOVAL APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2000/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ELIMINER DU CARBONE | [2000/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Request for further processing for: | 28.08.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2004 | BE | 28.01.2004 | CH | 28.01.2004 | CY | 28.01.2004 | FI | 28.01.2004 | FR | 28.01.2004 | IT | 28.01.2004 | LI | 28.01.2004 | NL | 28.01.2004 | DK | 28.04.2004 | GR | 28.04.2004 | SE | 28.04.2004 | DE | 29.04.2004 | ES | 09.05.2004 | PT | 28.06.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
FR | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
FR | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
DE | 29.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3881503 (FOX JOHN FRANCIS, et al) [Y] 1-9,13-15,20-35,42-45,50-52,55,58 * column 2, line 38 - column 6, line 19 * * figure - *; | [A]US4421131 (AUVIL JR RAYMOND G [US]); | [A]EP0282239 (CANTRELL IND INC [US]); | [Y]US4935066 (WRIGHT C E [US]) [Y] 1-9,13-15,20-35,42-45,50-52,55,58 * column W *; | [A]US5141009 (MORANTZ STAN [US]); | [A]CH682374 (MOBIL STAHLPRESSWERK AG) |