Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
19.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
03.01.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
14.11.2000 | Renewal fee | |
14.07.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
14.07.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
30.05.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.05.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.08.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.05.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.05.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.12.1998 | PCT data prior to European publication |