Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1169699 | Global Dossier | 07.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801882 | 12.11.1998 | US15708198 | 18.09.1998 | US97047597 | 14.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1030565 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9801882 | 12.11.1998 | US15708198 | 18.09.1998 | US97047597 | 14.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2308294 | 27.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9801882 | 12.11.1998 | US15708198 | 18.09.1998 | US97047597 | 14.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9925207 | Global Dossier | 27.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15708198 | 18.09.1998 | US97047597 | 14.11.1997 |