EP1030565 - DELIVERY SYSTEM BASED ON A DISPERSION OF AN EMULSIFIER IN AN AQUEOUS SOLUTION OF SUGAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1, P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUCET, Jim 16617 W. 143rd Terrace Olathe, KS 66062 / US | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Harding, Charles Thomas D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98954655.1 | 12.11.1998 | [2000/35] | WO1998IB01882 | Priority number, date | US19970970475 | 14.11.1997 Original published format: US 970475 | US19980157081 | 18.09.1998 Original published format: US 157081 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925207 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030565 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/035, A23L1/09, A21D2/18, A21D2/16, A23P1/04, A23L1/22 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
A21D2/181 (EP);
A21D2/16 (EP);
A23C13/14 (EP);
A23D7/0053 (EP);
A23D7/0056 (EP);
A23D7/015 (EP);
A23L13/426 (EP);
A23L13/428 (EP);
A23L27/30 (EP);
A23L27/80 (EP);
A23L29/10 (EP);
A23L29/37 (EP);
A23P10/35 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | ABGABESYSTEME AUF BASIS VON EINER DISPERSION VON EINEM EMULGATOR IN EINER WÄSSRIGEN ZUCKERLÖSUNG | [2000/35] | English: | DELIVERY SYSTEM BASED ON A DISPERSION OF AN EMULSIFIER IN AN AQUEOUS SOLUTION OF SUGAR | [2000/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION A BASE DE DISPERSION D'EMULSIFIANT DANS UNE SOLUTION AQUEUSE DE SUCRE | [2000/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 01.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4317839 (MITCHELL WILLIAM A, et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,25,33 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 15 * * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 32 * * column 6, line 60 - line 68 *; | [X]US3479189 (VRANG CARL, et al) [X] 1-3,6-18,22,24,26-33 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 23 * * column 6, line 44 - line 66 * * column 7, line 5 - line 24 *; | [X]US4168323 (INAMINE SHIGEO, et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11,25,33 * column 1X, line 50 - column 2, line 62 * * column 3, line 1 - line 11 * * examples 6,9,21 *; | [X]US4242364 (BOURNE RICHARD G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-18,22,23,25-29,31,33 * column 3, line 1 - column 8, line 2 *; | [X]US4835002 (WOLF PETER A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-33 * column 2, line 25 - column 8, line 55 * * column 11, line 4 - column 13, line 40 *; | [X]EP0659347 (SAN EI GEN FFI INC [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,25,26,33 * page 2, line 36 - line 52 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 53; example - *; | [X]US4293572 (SILVA ROY, et al) [X] 1-3,6-27,31,33 * column 6, line 25 - column 9, line 18 * * example - *; | [X]GB1416188 (GEN FOODS CORP) [X] 1-3,7-18,25-29,31,33 * page 2, line 126 - page 3, line 31 * * page 3, line 121 - page 4, line 25 * * page 4, line 75 - line 107 * * examples I,VIII,,X, *; | [X]US3936391 (GABBY JOHN LESTER, et al) [X] 1,12,25-27,31,33 * claim 1 *; | [X]FR1386841 (LEYBOLD HOCHVAKUUM ANLAGEN) [X] 1,6-18,25-29,31,33 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP0815730 (RIKEN VITAMIN CO [JP]) [XP] 1,6-18,25-27,31,33 * page 2, line 15 - line 20 * * page 3, line 38 - line 47 * |